This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 07:19:20 (UTC).

MONTOYA VS NICK BOONE (ASCEND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT)

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 MONTOYA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NICK BOONE ASCEND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1002

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MENDOZA, JOSE E

MONTOYA, DANIEL

Defendant

NICK BOONE (ASCEND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 04/21/2020 BY STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: To Continue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: Affidavit of Insuccessful Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MONTOYA, DANIEL, MENDOZA, JOSE E; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.