This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 09:18:36 (UTC).

MONTOYA ET AL VS BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 MONTOYA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3012

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MONTOYA, RACHELLE

DEATON, JOHN

Defendants

LUQUE, MARK

BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX PARNELL G

Defendant Attorney

HERR LEONARD C.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Parnell Fox RE: Summons (2nd time) REASON: some of the text is incomplete/cut off

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/15/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Parnell Fox RE: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Summons REASON: poor image quality on the Civil Case Cover Sheet; Summons is editable document with some text incomplete/cut off.

Electronic Rejection Notice

01/04/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Order

12/16/2022: Order

Electronic Rejection Notice

12/15/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice

12/15/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Ruling

11/04/2022: Ruling

Notice of Lodging

09/28/2022: Notice of Lodging

Stipulation and Order

10/04/2022: Stipulation and Order

Electronic Rejection Notice

09/27/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice

09/16/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Stipulation

09/07/2022: Stipulation

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

09/02/2022: Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

Notice

09/02/2022: Notice

Reply Brief

08/26/2022: Reply Brief

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

08/25/2022: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

Opposition

08/22/2022: Opposition

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Re: Order was signed on 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order; Comment: regarding Production of Subpoenaed Documents of Liberati & Associates; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DEATON, JOHN|PLAINTIFF - MONTOYA, RACHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: To: Parnel FoxRe: Proposed Order RE: Productions of Subpoenaed Docs of Liberati & Assoc.Reason: Please submit the Proposed Order Cover Sheet separately, however it is unnecessary , and submit a stand alone copy of the Proposed Order. Please review.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DEATON, JOHN|PLAINTIFF - MONTOYA, RACHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: To: Leonard C. HerrRe: Proposed OrderReason: Please submit the Proposed Order Cover Sheet separately, however it is uneccesary , and submit a stand alone copy of the Proposed Order. Please review.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation and Order; Comment: ***GRANTEDIT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to the supulatlon of the parti es, Defendant Bakersfield City School Distnct shall produce Nos 1 through 8, identified above, ofthe inthigation file of Liberati & Associates (unradacted and Bate's stamped) to Plaintiffs' counsel via e-scrve in PDF no late; than September 1.4 2022.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the two Investigative Reports, Nos. 9 and 10, ldanfiefifi above, shall be subjetct to an in camera inspection by the Court. Defendant shall lodge the reports with the Courtroom clerk for this Department under confidential status within a court reporter and will advise the parties of the courts ruling in writing. It the Court deems a further hearing necessary the court will advise the parties. If the Court deems it necessary to have a court reporter for the in camera review, the court will advise the parties and the parties may elect to provide a reporter.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT|DEFENDANT - LUQUE, MARK|PLAINTIFF - DEATON, JOHN|PLAINTIFF - MONTOYA, RACHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Lodging; Comment: Defendant Bakersfield City of; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT|DEFENDANT - LUQUE, MARK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: Answer to Complaint for Damages; Demand for Jury Trial; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT|DEFENDANT - LUQUE, MARK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: As to Bakersfield City School District, A Public Entity. Personal Service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DEATON, JOHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: as to Proof of Service: The party name listed for items 3.a and 6.d. do not conform to the Complaint. Please review.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DEATON, JOHN|PLAINTIFF - MONTOYA, RACHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Mark Luque via personal service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DEATON, JOHN|PLAINTIFF - MONTOYA, RACHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DEATON, JOHN|PLAINTIFF - MONTOYA, RACHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: TO: Attorney, Parnell FoxRE: Summons (2nd time)REASON: some of the text is incomplete/cut off

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DEATON, JOHN|PLAINTIFF - MONTOYA, RACHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 04/15/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: TO: Attorney, Parnell FoxRE: Civil Case Cover Sheet; SummonsREASON: poor image quality on the Civil Case Cover Sheet; Summons is editable document with some text incomplete/cut off.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DEATON, JOHN|PLAINTIFF - MONTOYA, RACHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Herr, Leonard C.