This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 02:47:43 (UTC).

MONTENEGRO VS MORA

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 MONTENEGRO filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against MORA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0015

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MONTENEGRO, ANNA M

Respondent

MORA, XIOMARA

 

Court Documents

Petition for Harassment

Petition for Harassment 10/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2019

HearingHearing Type: Petition for Harassment; Dept.: Lamont Division A; Result: Dismissed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2019

DocketFile Type: Dismissed Without Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2019

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service; Comment: AS TO XIOMARA MORA; Filed By: PETITIONER - MONTENEGRO, ANNA M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketFile Type: Proof of Personal Service (CH-200); Filed By: PETITIONER - MONTENEGRO, ANNA M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2019

DocketFile Type: Temporary Restraining Order (CH-110); Filed By: PETITIONER - MONTENEGRO, ANNA M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2019

DocketFile Type: Notice of Court Hearing (CH-109); Filed By: PETITIONER - MONTENEGRO, ANNA M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2019

DocketFile Type: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100); Filed By: PETITIONER - MONTENEGRO, ANNA M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2019

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PETITIONER - MONTENEGRO, ANNA M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less