This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 01:05:02 (UTC).

MONTELONGO VS MONTELONGO (B)

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 MONTELONGO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MONTELONGO B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Cannon, Gloria and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2136

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Cannon, Gloria

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MONTELONGO, VERONICA

Respondent

MONTELONGO, GERARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HART, CARL W, Jr.

HART, JR., CARL W

Respondent Attorney

STOKER, IRA L

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 05/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C PROP CNTRL 2 MINORS NO SERVICE; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 07/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C PROP CNTRL 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/25/17; Parties Present Petitioner: MONTELONGO, VERONICA; Attorney: HART, JR., CARL W; Respondent: MONTELONGO, GERARDO; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C PROP CNTRL 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/25/17 7/27/17; Parties Present Petitioner: MONTELONGO, VERONICA; Attorney: HART, CARL W, Jr.; Respondent: MONTELONGO, GERARDO; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C PROP CNTRL 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/25/17 7/27/17 8/14/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HART, CARL W, Jr.; Respondent; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/S S/S ATTY F/C 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/25/17 7/27/17 8/14/17 9/07/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HART, CARL W, Jr.

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 12/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/S S/S ATTY F/C 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/25/17 7/27/17 8/14/17 9/07/17 10/23/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HART, CARL W, Jr.; Respondent; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/S S/S ATTY F/C 2 MINORS CONT 5/25/17 7/27/17 8/14/17 9/07/17 10/23/17 12/13/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HART, CARL W, Jr.; Respondent; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 02/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/S S/S ATTY F/C 2 MINORS CONT 5/25/17 7/27/17 8/14/17 9/07/17 10/23/17 12/13/17 1/31/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HART, CARL W, Jr.; Respondent; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 03/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/S S/S ATTY F/C 2 MINORS CONT 5/25/17 7/27/17 8/14/17 9/07/17 10/23/17 12/13/17 1/31/18 2/28/18

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 07/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/S S/S ATTY F/C 2 MINORS CONT 5/25/17 7/27/17 8/14/17 9/07/17 10/23/17 12/13/17 1/31/18 2/28/18 3/28/18 5/9/18; Parties Present Petitioner: MONTELONGO, VERONICA; Respondent: MONTELONGO, GERARDO; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT RET'D TO ATTY BIN

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 5/20/19 SIGNED PURSUANT TO CCP 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT RET'D TO ATTY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 08/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C PROP CNTRL 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/25/17 7/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketOrder Appointing Counsel for Minor(s) - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: BARBARA MCDANIEL HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 07/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C PROP CNTRL 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Comment: HRG 07/27/17 DIV B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 05/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/25/17 PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C PROP CNTRL 2 MINORS NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketVoid: Entered in Error - Comment: Video 'TEST-1' completed by party on 05/04/2017 11:15:05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 05/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HART, CARL W, Jr.