Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:19:16 (UTC).

MONICA M DAY DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 MONICA M DAY DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2649

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAY-DORREL, ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Discharge order...returned via in pro per out basket

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 09/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Need allegation per Pc 9202(a) re Medi-Cal benefits. 2. Need allegation re notice to Franchise Tax Board per PC 9202(c). 3. Need dates of birth of decedent's grandchildren (Ian Maurer, Wylan Dorrel, Levi Dorell and Garret Dorrel) by way of verified supplement. 4. Was preliminary distribution re miscellaneous personal property (jewelry) done? Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 5. Need property on hand schedule. 6. Preliminary distribution was made outright to minor/grandson, Ian Maurer. Property consists of cash.**Property belonging to minor to be delivered to parent per PC 3400 & parent to file written assurance.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for final distribution...returned via in pro per out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER & LETTERS MAIL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Inventory & Appraisal .... Pro Per ( D )

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 10/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -; Parties Present Petitioner: DAY-DORREL, ELIZABETH

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 08/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Proof of Publication filed 08/11/17 does not comply with PC 8100. Need new proof of publication. 3. Supplement filed 08/08/17 total for number 7 is incorrect and should be $224,000.; Parties Present Petitioner: DAY-DORREL, ELIZABETH

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: (3) Notice of hearings returned via outbasket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Supplement to petition returned via outbasket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Will returned via in pro per out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Duties and Liabilities...returned via in pro per out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via in pro per out basket

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Final Discharge & Order-Estate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Discharge order...returned via in pro per out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order on final distribution and waiver of accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 9/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement #23 to petition for final distribution on waiver of accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketReceipt - Comment: Receipt by heir of the estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketReceipt - Comment: Receipt by heir of the estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 09/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Need allegation per Pc 9202(a) re Medi-Cal benefits. 2. Need allegation re notice to Franchise Tax Board per PC 9202(c). 3. Need dates of birth of decedent's grandchildren (Ian Maurer, Wylan Dorrel, Levi Dorell and Garret Dorrel) by way of verified supplement. 4. Was preliminary distribution re miscellaneous personal property (jewelry) done? Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 5. Need property on hand schedule. 6. Preliminary distribution was made outright to minor/grandson, Ian Maurer. Property consists of cash.**Property belonging to minor to be delivered to parent per PC 3400 & parent to file written assurance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to petition for final distribution on waiver of accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to petition for probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketLast Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: BRW-17-001185 4/28/2011 Eight (8) pageS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Will returned via in pro per out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Duties and Liabilities...returned via in pro per out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via in pro per out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Incomplete - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: Elizabeth Day-Dorrel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Elizabeth Day-Dorrel

    Read MoreRead Less