This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/04/2020 at 20:13:26 (UTC).

MODERN WAY MARKET VS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 10/21/2004 MODERN WAY MARKET filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4537

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MODERN WAY MARKET

Defendant

GARCIA, VERONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STASSINOS, PAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2007
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: COUNTY: KERN DATE OF RECORDING: 3/18/05 INSTRUMENT NUMBER: 0205067093

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2005
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2005
  • Docket117 Pmt: Abstract Issued / GC 26834 - Comment: Amount of $7.00 for MODERN WAY MARKET (PL-1). Received from PAUL STASSINOS, check no(s) 28471. Receipt #147098 for amount of $7.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: AFFIDAVIT RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CC 1719, PROOF OF MAILING, REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT THEREON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR: MODERN WAY MARKET JUDGMENT AGAINST: VERONICA GARCIA ATTORNEY FEES $ COSTS $ 190.30 INTERESTS $ TOTAL $ 1,710.30 RECORDED: DOCUMENT NO: PAGE(S):

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • DocketDefault Entered as Requested On - Comment: DATE: 01/20/05 PARTY: AGAINST VERONICA GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2004
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2004
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: MAIL/PERSONAL:BY MAIL ON 11/12/04 NAME OF DOCUMENT: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO CMC, NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, CIVIL MEDIATION, STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2004
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT WAS SERVED: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC; SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES, NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, CIVIL MEDIATION, STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION WHO WAS SERVED: VERONICA GARCIA AT 9112 MAXWELL CT., LAMONT CA. BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON 11/1/04 AT 6:48PM LEFT DOCUMENTS WITH CRUZ GARCIA - CO-TENANT BY PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2004
  • DocketOriginal Summons Returned - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2004
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2004
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2004
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2004
  • Docket843C Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 (1/1/04) - Comment: Amount of $145.30 for MODERN WAY MARKET (PL-1). Received from BRENDA MEDOWS, check no(s) 2343. Receipt #129077 for amount of $145.30.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2004
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 238

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STASSINOS, PAUL