This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 10:24:29 (UTC).

MITCHELL VS MITCHELL(B)

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 MITCHELL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MITCHELL B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cannon, Gloria and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3664

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cannon, Gloria

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MITCHELL, KARI

Respondent

MITCHELL, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCATEE, FRED S, II

Respondent Attorney

AZEMIKA, ANTHONY P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 11/18/2020 PET PROP CNTRL BUSINESS CNTRL CONTD FROM 07/29/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 11/18/2020 PET PROP CNTRL BUSINESS CNTRL CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 11/18/20 PET PROP CNTRL BUSINESS CNTRL NO SERVICE CONT FROM 2/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketResponse - Comment: E-FILED: DISSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: E-FILED: OLD PRO PER / NEW A.AZEMIKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 11/18/20 PET PROP CNTRL BUSINESS CNTRL NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: E FILED Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Denied (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: E-FILED POS of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET EX PARTE PROP CNTRL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: E FILED Ex Parte Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AZEMIKA, ANTHONY P