This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 02:49:05 (UTC).

MILLER VS WONG

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 MILLER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WONG. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0051

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER, JOAN G

Defendant

WONG, EDIE (EDITH)

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 07/14/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 07/13/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: MILLER, JOAN G; Defendant: WONG, EDIE (EDITH)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MILLER, JOAN G; Awarded Against: WONG, EDIE (EDITH); Amount; Damages: $850.00; Total: $850.00; Party: Names: MILLER, JOAN G; WONG, EDIE (EDITH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 07/14/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 07/13/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: FOR EDITH WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: for Edith Wong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Unclaimed - Comment: SERVICE REFUSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MILLER, JOAN G; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less