This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/27/2023 at 07:05:18 (UTC).

MILLER VS LOANCARE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 MILLER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LOANCARE LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0548

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER, RODNEY

Defendants

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

LOANCARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA ANTHONY P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

02/22/2023: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

02/23/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

02/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Declaration

02/22/2023: Declaration

Order to Show Cause

02/23/2023: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

02/28/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

02/28/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom 2 located at 3131 Arrow Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: AS TO LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, VIA PERSONAL SERVICE; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MILLER, RODNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to LOANCARE, LLC, VIA PERSONAL SERVICE; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MILLER, RODNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 6/8/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MILLER, RODNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: VERIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MILLER, RODNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MILLER, RODNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MILLER, RODNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less