This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/08/2021 at 05:15:55 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING V MEDINA

Case Summary

On 10/02/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEDINA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3917

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MEDINA, ROGELIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HENRIQUES, JANALIE A

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

HUNT, MICHAEL S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV); Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MEDINA, ROGELIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PARTIES ENTERED INTO A CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT. ~ calid=2369388 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:09/26/2014, Courtroom:AD, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:RST, SystemDate:10/3/2013 9:11:10 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS) - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • Docket185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of - Comment: Amount of $20.00 for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 434378, 434377. Receipt #752312 for amount of $245.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • Docket845W Pmt: Ltd Civil First Appearance < $10,000 GC 70614(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 434378, 434377. Receipt #752312 for amount of $245.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: OSC ON 03/28/2014 VACATED. ~ calid=2369384 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:03/28/2014, Courtroom:AD, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:RST, SystemDate:10/3/2013 9:10:54 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 26, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 26, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 28, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 28, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 413354. Receipt #741430 for amount of $225.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 851

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT MICHAEL S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENRIQUES JANALIE