This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 20:04:13 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS SOTO

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SOTO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0270

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SOTO, LORENZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAPIER, RACHEL N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer(s): Benavides, Jose R., Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; SOTO, LORENZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Served: 10/10/201710:16 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEES )CAL. BUS. & PROF. CODE 6322.1(C)(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less