Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 11:33:50 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS SMITH AKA DEBORA A SMITH

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SMITH AKA DEBORA A SMITH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pacione, Lisa M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0074

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pacione, Lisa M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SMITH AKA DEBORA A SMITH, DEBORAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUNG, HYO JIN JULIA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SMITH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JIN JULIA JUNG HYO