This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:30:53 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS SLISHER

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SLISHER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0626

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SLISHER, IDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FONG, KATHERINE K.

FONG, CATHERINE K.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Mail to Hunt & Henriques

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: SLISHER, IDA; Amount; Damages: $1,528.00; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $240.50; Total: $1768.50; Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; SLISHER, IDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2) - Comment: interest and Attorney fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: in support of application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civ. Code Sec. 1788.60(b)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Id aSlisher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less