This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 11:15:44 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS SEAMAN

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEAMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0551

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SEAMAN, GABRIELLA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CASEY, CHAD

HANKINS, ALEC W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketDisassociation of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: GABRIELLA SEAMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395(b); VENUE FOR PERSONAL, FAMILY, OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCTION IN FILING FEE PURSUANT TO BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 6322.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.