Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 21:59:10 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS RONNIE JUNG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RONNIE JUNG. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7143

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JUNG, RONNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON-MCELROY, SARAH A

Attorney at MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2014
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC., check no(s) 848178. Receipt #807990 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: ORIGINAL RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED. ~ calid=2301345 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:07/17/2014, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:elenaa, SystemDate:7/18/2013 4:49:12 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: TOTAL $17,005.70 AS TO RONNIE JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketOrder - Comment: GRANTING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033; INTEREST; AND EVIDENCE CODE 1550

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: AS TO RONNIE JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2301341 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:01/16/2014, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:elenaa, SystemDate:7/18/2013 4:48:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, DECLARATION OF VENUE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKET, NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHO SERVED: RONNIE JUNG HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 07/26/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • Docket844L Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC, check no(s) 30020672. Receipt #728886 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 17, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 17, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 16, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 16, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF VENUE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 776

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIDLAND FUNDING LLC - SARAH A. ROBINSON-MCELRO