This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:10:57 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS PRUNEDA

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PRUNEDA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tafoya, Robert S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0307

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tafoya, Robert S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PRUNEDA, ARMANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JUNG, HYO JIN JULIA

DE GUZMAN, NICHOL ALAN S.

POGOSIAN, JACK H

HANKINS, ALEC W

GABRIELOVA, KRISTY

 

Court Documents

Writ Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

Writ Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6: Comment: Los Angeles County

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 - Writ Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6: Comment: Los Angeles County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Los Angeles County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: PRUNEDA, ARMANDO; Amount; Damages: $1,213.76; Costs: $246.00; Total: $1459.76; Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; PRUNEDA, ARMANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration in Lieu of Testimony Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice, does 1 through 10 inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Served: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Declaration in Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.