This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 20:40:04 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS PEREZ

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0603

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PEREZ, JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO, ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Los Angeles county.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Orange County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: mail to Hunt & Henriques

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: PEREZ, JESUS; Amount; Damages: $3,307.01; Costs: $240.50; Total: $3547.51; Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; PEREZ, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: MEMO TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Computation of Interest and Lack - Comment: of Original Executed Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: AGAINST JESUS PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less