This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:54:52 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS PEREZ

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5774

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PEREZ, RAMIRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIELSKI, JESSICA LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: PEREZ, RAMIRO; Amount; Damages: $1,047.16; Costs: $282.50; Total: $1329.66; Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; PEREZ, RAMIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: DKR/MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Against Ramiro Perez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Counsel RE: Interest; Costs (CCP 1033); Attorney fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration in support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civ. Code Sec. 1788.60(b)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: As to Ramiro Perez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s):1A DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Ramiro Perez. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less