Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 12:38:12 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MILLAN

Case Summary

On 03/29/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILLAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7066

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MILLAN, JOEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON-MCELROY, SARAH A

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT MGMT

8875 Aero Dr #200

San Diego, CA 92123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: DISMISSAL DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: PROOF OF SERVIC E PROOF OF SERVIC E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 7/10/13. ~ calid=2206632 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:03/20/2014, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:VICKYG, SystemDate:3/29/2013 3:01:07 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED 4/18/13. ~ calid=2206629 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:09/19/2013, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:VICKYG, SystemDate:3/29/2013 3:00:32 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: TOTAL $3,182.69 AS TO JOEL MILLAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 585.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033; INTEREST; AND EVIDENCE CODE 1550

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: AS TO JOEL MILLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; DECLARATION OF VENUE; ADR PACKAGE; DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FES; STATMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION; NOTICE OF OSC; WHO SERVED: JOEL MILLAN HOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED SERVICE/MARIA CO-OCCUPANT DATE SERVED: 04/10/13

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 20, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 20, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 19, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 19, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF REDUCED FILING FEES PURSUANT TO CAL. BUS & PROF. CODE 6322.1(C)(1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Docket843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (PL-1). Received from MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, check no(s) 31784. Receipt #709805 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 775

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIDLAND FUNDING LLC - SARAH A. ROBINSON-MCELRO