This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:43 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MICHAEL BARTLETT AKA MICHAEL A. BARTLETT

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL BARTLETT AKA MICHAEL A BARTLETT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0213

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MICHAEL BARTLETT AKA MICHAEL A. BARTLETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SULLIVAN, PATRICK T

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT PACKET

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 11/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 07/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 05/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER DATED 04/02/18

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, JUDGEMENT, DECLARATION 1033, DECLARATION 585.. REJECTION STATES TO MAIL IT BUT THE PAPERS DID NOT FIT SO IT IS IN PICK-UP

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT PACKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV); Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MICHAEL BARTLETT AKA MICHAEL A. BARTLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 11/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 07/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 05/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER DATED 04/02/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 04/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, JUDGEMENT, DECLARATION 1033, DECLARATION 585.. REJECTION STATES TO MAIL IT BUT THE PAPERS DID NOT FIT SO IT IS IN PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR MICHAEL BARTLETT AKA MICHAEL A. BARTLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less