This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:34:03 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5934

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MARTINEZ, DEBORAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, EMILY B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Abstract of Judgement Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: MARTINEZ, DEBORAH; Amount; Damages: $3,424.66; Costs: $240.50; Total: $3665.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Against Deborah Martinez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Counsel RE: Interest; Costs (CCP 1033); Attorney fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration in support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civ. Code Sec. 1788.60(b)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: As to Deborah Martinez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO DEBORAH MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business & Professions Code Section 6322.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less