This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:55:17 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS LYNCH

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LYNCH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5785

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LYNCH, FRANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO, ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default Court Judgment packet - THE DATE ON LINE 1a OF YOUR REQUEST FOR DEFAULT/COURT JUDGMENT MUST BE THE DATE THE COMPLAINT WAS FILED, NOT THE DATE THE SUMMONS WAS ISSUED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: LYNCH, FRANK; Amount; Damages: $1,210.07; Costs: $282.50; Total: $1492.57; Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; LYNCH, FRANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO FRANK LYNCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Counsel RE: Interest; Costs (CCP 1033); Attorney fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration in support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civ. Code Sec. 1788.60(b)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: As to Frank Lynch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default Court Judgment packet - THE DATE ON LINE 1a OF YOUR REQUEST FOR DEFAULT/COURT JUDGMENT MUST BE THE DATE THE COMPLAINT WAS FILED, NOT THE DATE THE SUMMONS WAS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Frank Lynch. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less