This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/24/2022 at 07:37:44 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS LOPEZ MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOPEZ MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0065

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LOPEZ MARTINEZ, MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOM JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Complaint

09/10/2020: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

09/10/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Statement of Classification and Location

09/10/2020: Statement of Classification and Location

Declaration

09/10/2020: Declaration

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

09/10/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

09/10/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

09/18/2020: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

12/09/2020: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

Judgment by Default by Court

12/15/2020: Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court

12/15/2020: Judgment by Default by Court

Declaration

12/09/2020: Declaration

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

12/09/2020: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Declaration

12/09/2020: Declaration

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Declaration In Support; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered; Comment: Request for Entry of Default; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Re: Fee; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOM JONATHAN