This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:11:29 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS LETICIA VALDEZ AKA LETICIA M. VALDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LETICIA VALDEZ AKA LETICIA M VALDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0308

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LETICIA VALDEZ AKA LETICIA M. VALDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JUNG, HYO JIN JULIA

DE GUZMAN, NICHOL ALAN S.

POGOSIAN, JACK H

HANKINS, ALEC W

GABRIELOVA, KRISTY

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice:

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause

Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: dismissal Hearing Date: 12/14/18 Hearing Time: 10:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: Case dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial; Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; LETICIA VALDEZ AKA LETICIA M. VALDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: dismissal Hearing Date: 12/14/18 Hearing Time: 10:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Served: 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Reduction in Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.