This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 01:45:59 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS JOHN RODRIGUEZ AKA JOHN P RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN RODRIGUEZ AKA JOHN P RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0113

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JOHN RODRIGUEZ AKA JOHN P RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRASER, DEANNA M

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 10/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer(s): Benavides, Jose R., Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Before Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 10/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less