This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 19:16:20 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS LARGAESPADA

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LARGAESPADA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0204

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LARGAESPADA, RAMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH CHRISTOPHER D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d): Comment: New OSC date 4/2/2020

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 06/11/2020: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: Hearing moved per Standing Order

Complaint

09/17/2019: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

09/17/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Statement of Classification and Location

09/17/2019: Statement of Classification and Location

Declaration

09/17/2019: Declaration

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

09/17/2019: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

09/17/2019: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

03/17/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

07/28/2020: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

07/28/2020: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

06/11/2020: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Comment: CORRECTED VERSION SENT VIA EMAIL TO LAW OFFICE; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2020
View Court Documents

HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d); Dept.: Lamont Division B; Result: Dismissed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d); Comment: New OSC date 4/2/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Declaration; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less