Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 03:20:57 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS HIRSCHFELDER

Case Summary

On 01/31/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HIRSCHFELDER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0000

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HIRSCHFELDER, RAINER E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALSH, MARK D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: NO PROOF OF SERVICE NO PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT FILED ~ calid=1828131 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:01/28/2013, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, Deputy:YESENIAT, SystemDate:1/31/2012 11:50:22 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC JUDGMENT AGAINST: RAINER E HIRSCHFELDER PRINCIPLE/DAMAGES: $4,824.92 PREJUGMENT INTEREST: $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES: $0.00 COSTS: $240.50 TOTAL: $5,065.42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • DocketOrder - Comment: GRANTING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: OF LOST NOTE IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT CCP 585(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration - Comment: SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION(CCP585(D)) RE: INTEREST AND REQUEST FOR USE OF COPIES-GOOD CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration - Comment: FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION (CCP585(D)) RE: CASE SUMMARY AND WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: COMPETENCY OF WITNESS TO TESTIFY TO THE CONTENTS OF THE PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPPORT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ONLY AS TO THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION, BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2012
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=1828126 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:07/30/2012, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, Deputy:YESENIAT, SystemDate:1/31/2012 11:47:08 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: RE: RAINER E HIRSCHFELDER PERSONAL SERVICE 02/04/12 COST: $59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 28, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 28, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 30, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 30, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Docket843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC, check no(s) 205108. Receipt #636139 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 737

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES INC. - MARK D. WALSH