This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:12 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS HIRACHETA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HIRACHETA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5947

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendant

HIRACHETA, JOHNNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BURROWS, JASON M

ZELLER, STEPHEN S

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default Court judgment packet - missing required Dismissal of Does

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: cont'd from 9/17/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK; Awarded Against: HIRACHETA, JOHNNY; Amount; Damages: $1,950.72; Costs: $303.75; Total: $2254.47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to Johnny Hiracheta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Jane Kellner in support of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice. As to DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default Court judgment packet - missing required Dismissal of Does

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s):1A DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO JOHNNY HIRACHETA, SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less