This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:55:20 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS HEALY

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HEALY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5786

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HEALY, JENNIFER L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIELSKI, JESSICA LEE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 1a does not conform to the date the complaint was filed. Returned via SASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 1a does not conform to the date the complaint was filed. Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Jennifer L Healy. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less