This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 16:57:01 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, VS GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Camacho, Marcos R., Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0036

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Camacho, Marcos R.

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC,

Defendants

GONZALEZ, DANIEL T

GONZALEZ, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SULLIVAN, PATRICK T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: SAN DIEGO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: SAN DIEGO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC,; Awarded Against: GONZALEZ, DANIEL; Amount; Damages: $3,509.68; Costs: $317.00; Total: $3826.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC,; Served: 03/13/20169:14 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCTION IN FILING FEE PURSUANT TO BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 6322.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395(D); VENUE FOR PERSONAL, FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK T SULLIVAN