This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/04/2020 at 05:26:36 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0122

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ELIZABETH, PEREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH, CHRIS D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: **Hearing continued from 05/11/20 pursuant to Standing Order**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: 5/11/20 8:30am Dept. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Perez Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Perez Elizabeth via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/06/20208:18 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Reduced Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.