This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 18:06:20 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS ELFORD

Case Summary

On 09/13/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELFORD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0557

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ELFORD, YVETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO, ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: COURT DEFAULT PACKET ADDRESSING MONEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL TO HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: ELFORD, YVETTE; Amount; Damages: $1,141.32; Costs: $240.50; Total: $1381.82; Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; ELFORD, YVETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: MEMO TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 1788.60(B)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: AGAINST YVETTE ELFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR YVETTE ELFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: COURT DEFAULT PACKET ADDRESSING MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less