This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 16:00:23 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS EDNITA MIRANDA AKA EDNITA E. MIRANDA

Case Summary

On 01/25/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDNITA MIRANDA AKA EDNITA E MIRANDA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0022

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

EDNITA MIRANDA AKA EDNITA E. MIRANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SNYDER, DAVID B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: EDNITA MIRANDA AKA EDNITA E. MIRANDA; Amount; Damages: $4,158.03; Costs: $249.00; Total: $4407.03; Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; EDNITA MIRANDA AKA EDNITA E. MIRANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Application for Entry of Judgment Persuant to C.C.P 585 (a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1 through 10, inclusive.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: Reset to 02/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Served: 02/06/201611:47 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketLetter Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP Section 395(b); Venue for Personal, Family or Household Obligations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.