This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:49:12 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS DIXIE RICHARDSON AKA DIXIE L. RICHARDSON

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIXIE RICHARDSON AKA DIXIE L RICHARDSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1835

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

DIXIE RICHARDSON AKA DIXIE L. RICHARDSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SULLIVAN, PATRICK T

DE GUZMAN, NICHOL ALAN S.

POGOSIAN, JACK H

HANKINS, ALEC W

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 08/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 07/31/18

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 07/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 03/49/18, 05/29/18

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 05/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 03/19/18

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 03/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 08/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 07/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 07/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 03/49/18, 05/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 05/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 03/19/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 03/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketDisassociation of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s):1A DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO DIXIE RICHARDSON, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less