This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/13/2020 at 03:50:46 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS CRESPO

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CRESPO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8793

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

CRESPO, WILLIAM

CRESPO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGORYAN, MELINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: CRESPO, WILLIAM; Amount; Damages: $4,877.96; Costs: $271.90; Total: $5149.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Against William Crespo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration In Support 585 a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to William Crespo on complaint filed 11/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to defendant William Crespo; personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: re Reduced Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.