This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:34 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS CONNER

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CONNER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1819

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CONNER, MATT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO, ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned and Filed - Comment: COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: YOLO/MONEY - RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO/MONEY/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: ISSUED/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: CONNER, MATT; Amount; Damages: $1,145.45; Costs: $284.50; Total: $1429.95; Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; CONNER, MATT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO MATT CONNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 1788.60b

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to MATT CONNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Matt Conner , sub service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less