This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/16/2020 at 09:43:56 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS ALMANZA

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALMANZA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0247

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding Llc

Defendant

Almanza, Agustin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARNOLD, CHRISTINA M.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal: Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal:

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal:

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal: Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO AGUSTIN ALMANZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.