This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 08:05:41 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V CACHOLA

Case Summary

On 12/11/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CACHOLA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3992

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CACHOLA, REYNOLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWN, TIMOTHY S

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

HARRIS, STELIOS A

ETSELL, KAREN L

ROBINSON-MCELROY, SARAH A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 - Comment: Los Angeles County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 - Comment: Los Angeles County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 436661. Receipt #812439 for amount of $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: OSC VACATED. ~ calid=2430009 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:12/05/2014, Courtroom:AD, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:RST, SystemDate:12/12/2013 3:05:40 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: GRANTING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketDeclaration Re Computation of Interest and Lack - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 05, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 05, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 06, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 06, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketStatement - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: REDUCED FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • Docket843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 30027061. Receipt #753273 for amount of $181.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ETSELL, KAREN L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIDLAND FUNDING LLC - SARAH A. ROBINSON-MCELRO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy S Brown