This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 03:08:42 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK, VS GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GOMEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven, DelPellegrino, Victoria and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0131

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

DelPellegrino, Victoria

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK,

Defendant

GOMEZ, VERONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZELLER, STEPHEN S

 

Court Documents

Court Trial

Court Trial 01/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 01/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer(s): Benavides, Jose R., DelPellegrino, Victoria; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketResponse - Comment: TO: FORM INTERROGATORIES; SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 09/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ENDORSED COPY OF ORDER ON FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: AS TO WINN LAW GROUP APLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK,; Served: 05/25/20174:54 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less