This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 14:20:09 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. VS GARRETT, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARRETT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0499

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A.

Defendants

GARRETT, WHITNEY

WHITNEY GARRETT AKA WHITNEY D GARRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LYNES, NICHOLAS WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Declaration & Judgment

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default Package

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default package

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Los Angeles. E-file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A.; LYNES, NICHOLAS WILLIAM; Awarded Against: WHITNEY GARRETT AKA WHITNEY D GARRETT; Amount; Damages: $2,971.75; Costs: $303.75; Total: $3275.50; Party: Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A.; GARRETT, WHITNEY; WHITNEY GARRETT AKA WHITNEY D GARRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Declaration & Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF JAMES KOEHN in Support of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Does 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default Package

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default package

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 08/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR WHITNEY GARRETT AKA WHITNEY D GARRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less