This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/04/2020 at 07:25:18 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc VS Valencia

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Valencia. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

Defendant

Valencia, Cesar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARRINCON-TEPELI, GISSELA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Midland Credit Management Inc; Awarded Against: Valencia, Cesar; Amount; Damages: $5,405.35; Costs: $320.00; Total: $5725.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: Emailed to: mandarichca@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: Memo to JO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: As to Does 1 through 10 only. Returned via efile.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: CESAR VALENCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.