This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 08:46:32 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS OGRADY

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OGRADY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pacione, Lisa M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0133

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pacione, Lisa M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

OGRADY, DONALD W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGORYAN, MELINE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meline Grigoryan