This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 12:54:10 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS NAJERA

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NAJERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0126

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

NAJERA, KATHYA I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH, CHRIS D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.; Awarded Against: NAJERA, KATHYA I; Amount; Damages: $3,366.35; Costs: $276.00; Total: $3642.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: against defendant Kathya I. Najera.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: without prejudice as to does 1-10 only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Kathya I. Najera on Complaint filed 1/6/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Kathya I. Najera, via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/20/20206:19 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Reduced Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.