This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/25/2022 at 10:56:43 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC, ET AL VS MONTES

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONTES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0207

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendant

MONTES, LAURA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH CHRISTOPHER D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Writ of Execution Issued

03/03/2021: Writ of Execution Issued

Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

03/03/2021: Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

Judgment by Default by Court

12/08/2020: Judgment by Default by Court

Order

12/08/2020: Order

Declaration

12/07/2020: Declaration

Declaration

12/07/2020: Declaration

Declaration

12/07/2020: Declaration

Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

12/07/2020: Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

12/07/2020: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

12/07/2020: Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

Proof of Service of Summons

10/19/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

09/08/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

09/08/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Declaration

09/04/2020: Declaration

Statement of Classification and Location

09/04/2020: Statement of Classification and Location

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/04/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: - Kern County; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Comment: Courtesy copy sent by email to mandarichca@abclegal.com; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order; Comment: Courtesy copy sent by email to mandarichca@abclegal.com; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: in Support of Calculation of Accured Interest and Attorneys Fees; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Re: Copies in Lieu of Originals; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: Without prejudice, does 1 through 10 only; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Re: Fee; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mandarich, Christopher D