Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/13/2021 at 07:22:46 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS MATA

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4465

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

MATA, ANNA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERK, CAMRYN P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration to Pursuant 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: As to Anna L Mata on complaint filed 10/14/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Reduced Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERK CAMRYN P.