This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/22/2020 at 09:31:27 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS MARISCAL

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARISCAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0125

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

MARISCAL, ANASTACIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERK, CAMRYN P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal:

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal:

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal: Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal: Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/24/20207:46 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less