This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/18/2020 at 08:52:50 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. VS Madden

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Madden. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern River Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0031

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kern River Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Defendants

Madden, Michael

Madden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE GUZMAN, NICHOL ALAN S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(f) - Portal:

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(d) - Portal:

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(f) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(d) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(f) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(d) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less