This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 03:09:22 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS LAMBERT

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LAMBERT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8777

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

LAMBERT, LARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARNOLD, CHRISTINA M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.; Awarded Against: LAMBERT, LARRY; Amount; Damages: $1,503.23; Costs: $271.90; Total: $1775.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: against defendant Larry Lambert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: in Support 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: without prejudice as to does 1-10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: 1033/1550

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Larry Lambert on Complaint filed 11/18/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to defendant Larry Lambert; personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: re Reduced Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less