This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:18:59 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS JESSICA L ANDREOTTI AKA JESSICA L. ANDREOTTI

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JESSICA L ANDREOTTI AKA JESSICA L ANDREOTTI. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0011

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

JESSICA L ANDREOTTI AKA JESSICA L. ANDREOTTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TULPULE, MANASI A

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDismissed With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/30/20207:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: FOR JESSICA L ANDREOTTI AKA JESSICA L ANDREOTTI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.