This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:15:58 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS HERMANDEZ

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERMANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

HERMANDEZ, ARMANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

METZGER, SHANA J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.